Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/08/2020 at 06:58:41 (UTC).

LOPEZ JIMMIE, ORTEGON THANKSEGOIVA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 LOPEZ JIMMIE, ORTEGON THANKSEGOIVA was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4235

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

LOPEZ JIMMIE

Applicant

ORTEGON THANKSEGOIVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

RILEY HILARY LYNN

 

Court Documents

ORD:CV MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER

07/26/2019 - ORD:CV MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER

MSC:CV OTHER

07/26/2019 - MSC:CV OTHER

NTC:CV SETTING

07/16/2019 - NTC:CV SETTING

DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

05/31/2019 - DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

05/23/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

05/21/2019 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

05/21/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

05/20/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ORD:CV MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: MSC:CV OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO LAW ENFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:CV COP SENT TO APPLICANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV CIT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: VJ:CV VISIT JDG ORDER:UCDKT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY HILARY LYNN