This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 08/18/2019 at 17:37:09 (UTC).

LION CAPITAL, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 LION CAPITAL, LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1480

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LION CAPITAL, LLC

Defendant

KELLEY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETTERSON ELIZABETH ANN

Defendant Attorney

THOMPSON CARTER HILL

 

Court Documents

PLD:CV ANSWER

04/09/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

03/04/2019 - RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

02/28/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

02/22/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

02/25/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

02/19/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • PLD:CV ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • ISS:CV CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • ISS:CV CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less