This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 10/15/2020 at 13:52:58 (UTC).

KITCHENS AUBREY L, KITCHENS AUBREY LEE JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 KITCHENS AUBREY L, KITCHENS AUBREY LEE JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1905

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

KITCHENS AUBREY L

Applicants

KITCHENS AUBREY LEE JR

KITCHENS REX ALTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

CIGARROA LORENZA G.

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB WILL

09/28/2020 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

09/28/2020 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:PB NOTICE RETURNED POSTED

09/25/2020 - PLD:PB NOTICE RETURNED POSTED

PLD:PB APPOINTMENT OF R/A

09/24/2020 - PLD:PB APPOINTMENT OF R/A

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

09/24/2020 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

09/24/2020 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

09/24/2020 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

09/24/2020 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:PB SENT TO VOTERS REG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB NOTICE RETURNED POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CONSTABLE SERVICE FEE; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: PLD:PB APPOINTMENT OF R/A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CONSTABLE SERVICE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less