This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 07:22:46 (UTC).

KING ROGER, PILLOT MARY Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 KING ROGER, PILLOT MARY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0350

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

PILLOT MARY

Not Classified By Court

KING ROGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

POWDRILL ELIZABETH THOMAS

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

03/19/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED MUNIMENT

03/19/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED MUNIMENT

PLD:PB AFFIDAVIT

03/19/2019 - PLD:PB AFFIDAVIT

PLD:PB WILL

02/19/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

02/19/2019 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/15/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/14/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/14/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPLICATION MUNIMENT

02/14/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION MUNIMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED MUNIMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION MUNIMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NTC MUNIMNT OF TTL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less