This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 07:23:26 (UTC).

KARLSON MARTHA, WILLIAMS JOYCE ANGELA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 KARLSON MARTHA, WILLIAMS JOYCE ANGELA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0357

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

KARLSON MARTHA

Not Classified By Court

WILLIAMS JOYCE ANGELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

ALEXANDER CLINTON WAYNE

Not Classified By Court Attorney

PHELAN MAURA

 

Court Documents

ORD:PB APPV EXT TIME FILE INVE

09/09/2019 - ORD:PB APPV EXT TIME FILE INVE

PLD:PB EXTEND TIME FILE INVENT

08/28/2019 - PLD:PB EXTEND TIME FILE INVENT

MSC:PB REQ TO CLRK FOR ISSUANC

07/09/2019 - MSC:PB REQ TO CLRK FOR ISSUANC

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

06/11/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB NOTICE OF HEARING

05/20/2019 - PLD:PB NOTICE OF HEARING

DSC:ANSWER TO DEPO ON WRIT QUE

05/14/2019 - DSC:ANSWER TO DEPO ON WRIT QUE

DSC:ANSWER TO DEPO ON WRIT QUE

04/24/2019 - DSC:ANSWER TO DEPO ON WRIT QUE

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

03/29/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

03/29/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

NTC:PB INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

03/22/2019 - NTC:PB INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

NTC:PB INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

03/22/2019 - NTC:PB INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

03/08/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB CIT BY PUBLIC RET FILED

03/08/2019 - PLD:PB CIT BY PUBLIC RET FILED

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

02/25/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

NTC:PB INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

02/14/2019 - NTC:PB INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

NTC:PB INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

02/14/2019 - NTC:PB INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

OPN:PB APPL APPT IND ADMN HEIR

02/14/2019 - OPN:PB APPL APPT IND ADMN HEIR

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/14/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:PB COPY REQ SENT TO CUSTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PC1:DEC/DA/GDN(55)INV EXT(+DD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MSC:PB COPY REQ SENT TO CUSTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NTC IND ADM HEIR; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: ISS:PB CIT PUBLICATION AFTER; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: NTC:PB INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: NTC:PB INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: OPN:PB APPL APPT IND ADMN HEIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CONSTABLE SERVICE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB HEIRSHIP FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $317.00

    Read MoreRead Less