This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/07/2020 at 16:40:34 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., PALLIDA, L.L.C., SUCCESOR IN INTEREST OF PHARIA, L.L.C. Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A , PALLIDA, L L C , SUCCESOR IN INTEREST OF PHARIA, L L C was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2339

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Defendant

SEGOVIA GRACIE

Garnishee

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Garnishor

PALLIDA, L.L.C., SUCCESOR IN INTEREST OF PHARIA, L.L.C.

 

Court Documents

RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

06/24/2019 - RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

06/13/2019 - DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

06/06/2019 - RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

06/06/2019 - NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

05/09/2019 - RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

03/14/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

03/14/2019 - MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

OPN:CV APPLICATION FILED

03/14/2019 - OPN:CV APPLICATION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: TWONG:CV NON SUIT ORD SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV GARNISHMENT FILING FEE; Amount: $247.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV POSTJUDG GARNISHMENT; Party Type: GS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: GR1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV GARNISHMENT FILING FEE; Party Type: GR1; Amount: $247.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:CV APPLICATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less