This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 11/28/2022 at 17:33:11 (UTC).

Jordyn Ray, Plaintiff VS. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 Jordyn Ray, Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Defendant. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WONG, TODD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3726

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

WONG, TODD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ray, Jordyn

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OGLE, SCOTT PATRICK

 

Court Documents

PUBLIC - E-Filed Petition

CV County Clerk Public Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketPLD:CV AMENDED ANSWER; Comment: Defendant's Original Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketPLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Comment: Affidavit of Service 10/04/22 AT 3:18PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketISS:CV CITATION; Comment: SOGLELAW@PEOPLEPC.COM; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filed Petition; Comment: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketOPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OGLE SCOTT PATRICK