This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/07/2020 at 09:10:15 (UTC).

ITRIA VENTURES, LLC VS MOAK LOGISTICS LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 ITRIA VENTURES, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MOAK LOGISTICS LLC. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1725

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ITRIA VENTURES, LLC

Defendants

OCHIENG KELLY ASTLEY

MOAK LOGISTICS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY IAN ANDREW

 

Court Documents

RET:CV EXECUTION RET EXECUTED

09/09/2019 - RET:CV EXECUTION RET EXECUTED

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

06/04/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

RET:CV NTC FOREIGN JDGMNT RET

05/30/2019 - RET:CV NTC FOREIGN JDGMNT RET

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/26/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

OPN:CV AFFIDAVIT FOREIGN JDGMN

02/21/2019 - OPN:CV AFFIDAVIT FOREIGN JDGMN

PLD:CV CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/21/2019 - PLD:CV CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV EXECUTION RET EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV EXECUTION ISSUED; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUE; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV NTC FOREIGN JDGMNT RET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV NOTICE FOREIGN JUDG; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV FOREIGN JUDGMENT FILING; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV FOREIGN JUDGMENT FILING; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: DSP:CV FOREIGN JDGMNT DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV AFFIDAVIT FOREIGN JDGMN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less