This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 09:57:52 (UTC).

ITRIA VENTURES LLC, VS KARNA MRIDULA LAL Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 ITRIA VENTURES LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KARNA MRIDULA LAL. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0595

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ITRIA VENTURES LLC,

Defendants

SHOWBIZ MULTIMEDIA LLC

KARNA MRIDULA LAL

KARNA VINAY KUMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY IAN ANDREW

 

Court Documents

MOT:CV TRANSFER VENUE

02/07/2019 - MOT:CV TRANSFER VENUE

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/22/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:CV CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

01/18/2019 - PLD:CV CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

OPN:CV AFFIDAVIT FOREIGN JDGMN

01/18/2019 - OPN:CV AFFIDAVIT FOREIGN JDGMN

PLD:CV RELEASE OF JUDGMENT

06/20/2019 - PLD:CV RELEASE OF JUDGMENT

RET:CV EXECUTION RET EXECUTED

06/11/2019 - RET:CV EXECUTION RET EXECUTED

NTC:CV HEARING

03/27/2019 - NTC:CV HEARING

MOT:CV OTHER

03/27/2019 - MOT:CV OTHER

MSC:CV REQUEST FOR WRIT EXECUT

03/07/2019 - MSC:CV REQUEST FOR WRIT EXECUT

PLD:CV ANSWER

02/08/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

MOT:CV TRANSFER VENUE

02/07/2019 - MOT:CV TRANSFER VENUE

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/22/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:CV CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

01/18/2019 - PLD:CV CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

OPN:CV AFFIDAVIT FOREIGN JDGMN

01/18/2019 - OPN:CV AFFIDAVIT FOREIGN JDGMN

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV RELEASE OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV EXECUTION RET EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: MTN FOR LEAVE; Court Name: COUNTY COURT AT LAW #1; Duration: 20 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: M/STAY; Court Name: COUNTY COURT AT LAW #1; Duration: 20 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: NTC:CV HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MOT:CV OTHER; Party Type: DF2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUE; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV EXECUTION ISSUED; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:CV REQUEST FOR WRIT EXECUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MOT:CV TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV NOTICE FOREIGN JUDG; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV FOREIGN JUDGMENT FILING; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV AFFIDAVIT FOREIGN JDGMN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV FOREIGN JUDGMENT FILING; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less