This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 12/08/2022 at 15:04:56 (UTC).

JOSH HUDNALL, Plaintiff VS. FOURT REALTY LLCMAINTENANCE SERVICES LLC, Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 JOSH HUDNALL, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against FOURT REALTY LLCMAINTENANCE SERVICES LLC, Defendant. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WONG, TODD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2074

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

WONG, TODD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUDNALL, JOSH

Defendants

FOURT REALTY LLC

MAINTENANCE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OGLE, SCOTT PATRICK

Other Attorneys

CHAMBERLAIN, DAVID E.

 

Court Documents

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

05/03/2021 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

05/17/2021 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

05/17/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/19/2021 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • DispositionCase Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketConverted Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDSP:CV NOTICE OF NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Party: Defendant FOURT REALTY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Party: Defendant FOURT REALTY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketISS:CV CITATION; Comment: EMAILED TO soglelaw@peoplepc.com; Party: Defendant FOURT REALTY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMBERLAIN DAVID E.