Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/08/2020 at 20:55:45 (UTC).

HOOPAUGH DANIELLE, HOOPAUGH MATHEW Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 HOOPAUGH DANIELLE, HOOPAUGH MATHEW was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5689

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

HOOPAUGH MATHEW

Applicant

HOOPAUGH DANIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

TRISTAN LIZBETH

 

Court Documents

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE OR UNSRVD

08/06/2019 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE OR UNSRVD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

07/23/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

07/19/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

07/19/2019 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

07/19/2019 - MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

07/10/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

07/10/2019 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

07/09/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE OR UNSRVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: CAL:OFF DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV EXT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: EMS:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV CIT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRISTAN LIZBETH