This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/03/2023 at 19:08:42 (UTC).

HOMEOWNERS OF AMERICA AS SUBROGEE OF JILL ALLEN, Plaintiff VS. ROTO-ROOTER SERVICES COMPANY, Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 HOMEOWNERS OF AMERICA AS SUBROGEE OF JILL ALLEN, Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROTO-ROOTER SERVICES COMPANY, Defendant. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WONG, TODD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4730

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

WONG, TODD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOMEOWNERS OF AMERICA AS SUBROGEE OF JILL ALLEN

Defendant

ROTO-ROOTER SERVICES COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REDDALL, JEFFREY S

 

Court Documents

PUBLIC - E-Filed Petition

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:CV ANSWER

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

CV County Clerk Public Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT; Comment: Notice of Filing Rule 11 Agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVICE 12/15/2022 at 2:44pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV ANSWER; Comment: Defendant's Original Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketISS:CV CITATION; Comment: JEFF@REDDALL-LAW.COM; Party: Defendant ROTO-ROOTER SERVICES COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filed Petition; Comment: Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketOPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less