Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 07/24/2020 at 01:09:19 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ ARGUETA JOSE, VEGA YAMILEX Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 HERNANDEZ ARGUETA JOSE, VEGA YAMILEX was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8650

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

HERNANDEZ ARGUETA JOSE

Applicant

VEGA YAMILEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

RILEY HILARY LYNN

 

Court Documents

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

12/03/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

PLD:CV OTHER

11/25/2019 - PLD:CV OTHER

DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

11/15/2019 - DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

11/15/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

11/14/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

11/01/2019 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

11/01/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

11/01/2019 - MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

10/23/2019 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

10/23/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

10/22/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:CV GENERAL NOTICE; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:CV COP SENT TO APPLICANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO APD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV EXT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: EMS:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CIT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY HILARY LYNN