This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 07:12:07 (UTC).

HENDRICK MARIE HURLEY, HENDRICK WILLIAM L. Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 HENDRICK MARIE HURLEY, HENDRICK WILLIAM L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0306

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

HENDRICK MARIE HURLEY

Applicant

HENDRICK WILLIAM L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

KOCUREK KELLY CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

06/24/2019 - PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

06/19/2019 - PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

03/27/2019 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

03/14/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB OATH

03/14/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

03/14/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/15/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/12/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB APPOINTMENT OF R/A

02/11/2019 - PLD:PB APPOINTMENT OF R/A

PLD:PB WILL

02/11/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

02/08/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ADMIN OF OATH; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:PB OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB APPOINTMENT OF R/A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less