This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 07:07:30 (UTC).

HENDERSON LONNIE CICERO JR, HENDERSON LONNIE COLE Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 HENDERSON LONNIE CICERO JR, HENDERSON LONNIE COLE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0288

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

HENDERSON LONNIE COLE

Not Classified By Court

HENDERSON LONNIE CICERO JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

LIONE RYAN WESLEY

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

02/06/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

03/28/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

03/25/2019 - PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

PLD:PB WILL

02/25/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/07/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

02/06/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/06/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

02/06/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

09/25/2019 - PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/07/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/06/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

02/06/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

PLD:PB EXTEND TIME FILE INVENT

07/02/2019 - PLD:PB EXTEND TIME FILE INVENT

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

05/06/2019 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

PLD:PB OATH

03/28/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

02/25/2019 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ORD:PB APPV EXT TIME FILE INVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PC1:DEC/DA/GDN(55)INV EXT(+DD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB EXTEND TIME FILE INVENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less