This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/21/2020 at 10:55:21 (UTC).

HALL CHRISTIE

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 HALL CHRISTIE was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0405

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HALL CHRISTIE

LITTLETON STEPHENIE

Defendant

MITHCELL MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABRAMOWITZ JOHN BENNETT

 

Court Documents

PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

08/27/2019 - PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/16/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/14/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

01/31/2018 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

07/22/2019 - PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

07/22/2019 - PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

PLD:CV LETTER TO COUNSEL

03/21/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO COUNSEL

PLD:CV ANSWER

02/19/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

01/31/2018 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/16/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/14/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: JURY TRIAL; Court Name: COUNTY COURT AT LAW #1; Jury: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: PRETRIAL MOTIONS; Court Name: COUNTY COURT AT LAW #1; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO; Amount: $586.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO; Amount: $508.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO; Amount: $604.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV JURY DEMAND FEE; Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CV JURY DEMAND FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less