This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 06/21/2020 at 20:06:47 (UTC).

GUAJARDO OSVALDO, IBARRA IDELIA S. Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 GUAJARDO OSVALDO, IBARRA IDELIA S was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2138

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

GUAJARDO OSVALDO

Not Classified By Court

IBARRA IDELIA S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

ALEXANDER CLINTON WAYNE

 

Court Documents

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

04/22/2020 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

04/16/2020 - PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

MSC:PB REQ TO CLRK FOR ISSUANC

04/02/2020 - MSC:PB REQ TO CLRK FOR ISSUANC

PLD:PB OATH

04/02/2020 - PLD:PB OATH

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

04/02/2020 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

03/25/2020 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

03/25/2020 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB WILL

11/12/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

11/08/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

11/07/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

11/07/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

11/07/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

11/07/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:PB LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: MSC:PB REQ TO CLRK FOR ISSUANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CONSTABLE SERVICE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.