This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/07/2020 at 09:07:27 (UTC).

GREATER TEXAS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, JOHNSON BOYCE C Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 GREATER TEXAS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, JOHNSON BOYCE C was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1613

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Defendant

JOHNSON BOYCE C

Garnishee

VELOCITY CREDIT UNION

Garnishor

GREATER TEXAS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Garnishee Attorney

CAMILLONE CHRISTOPHER NICHOLAS

Garnishor Attorney

ADAMO ANNA JANINE WILLIAMS

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

04/26/2019 - DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

04/17/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

04/17/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

04/17/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:CV ANSWER

04/05/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

MSC:CV GARNISHMENT NOTICE

04/01/2019 - MSC:CV GARNISHMENT NOTICE

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

04/01/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

03/20/2019 - RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

OPN:CV APPLICATION FILED

02/21/2019 - OPN:CV APPLICATION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: EMS:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MSC:CV GARNISHMENT NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED; Amount: $115.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV POSTJUDG GARNISHMENT; Party Type: GS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV GARNISHMENT FILING FEE; Amount: $247.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: GR1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV GARNISHMENT FILING FEE; Party Type: GR1; Amount: $247.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:CV APPLICATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less