This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 06:48:22 (UTC).

GONZALES BENITO, SWEM TERRY Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 GONZALES BENITO, SWEM TERRY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0223

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

GONZALES BENNIE JR

Not Classified By Court

GONZALES BENITO

Applicant

SWEM TERRY

Intervenor

AZUA MARY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

RICKHOFF LIESEL KATRINA

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LUTHER ROBERT BRUCE

Applicant Attorney

NICKERSON JULIA ASHMORE

Intervenor Attorney

MENDEZ BRYAN PATRICK

 

Court Documents

MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

02/05/2019 - MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

PLD:PB PLEADING OR MOTION

02/05/2019 - PLD:PB PLEADING OR MOTION

PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

02/01/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/01/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

02/01/2019 - ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/30/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

01/29/2019 - MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

01/29/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPL APPT AD DETER HEIR

01/29/2019 - OPN:PB APPL APPT AD DETER HEIR

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

01/22/2020 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

PLD:PB CITATION RET SERVED

12/13/2019 - PLD:PB CITATION RET SERVED

PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

11/26/2019 - PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

08/13/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/30/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:PB ORDER

03/29/2019 - ORD:PB ORDER

PLD:PB NOTICE OF HEARING

03/11/2019 - PLD:PB NOTICE OF HEARING

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

03/06/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/30/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ANSWER OF ATTY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MOT:PB WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTORNEY VACATION LTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT SRVC 202.057

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB CITATION RET SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:PB CIT PUBLICATION AFTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NTC ADM HEIRSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:PB AAL COPY ISS/SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB HEIRSHIP FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $317.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:PB APPL APPT AD DETER HEIR

    Read MoreRead Less