Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/18/2021 at 04:26:25 (UTC).

GOLDSMITH BERGEN, SCAFF EMMA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 GOLDSMITH BERGEN, SCAFF EMMA was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0972

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

GOLDSMITH BERGEN

Applicant

SCAFF EMMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

FINLEY FRANCES N.

 

Court Documents

ORD:CV CRIM TRESPASS WARNING

03/26/2021 - ORD:CV CRIM TRESPASS WARNING

DSP:CV DISMISS APPL PROT ORDER

03/26/2021 - DSP:CV DISMISS APPL PROT ORDER

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

03/12/2021 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

03/03/2021 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

03/03/2021 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/26/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

02/26/2021 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

02/26/2021 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ORD:CV CRIM TRESPASS WARNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DSP:CV DISMISS APPL PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:COVID APP FOR PO/TRO COMB; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: TWONG:JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINLEY FRANCES N.