This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 10/01/2022 at 20:22:30 (UTC).

NABIL GEBREAB VS. MANUEL ANAYA OCHOAJACOBS ENGINEERING INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 NABIL GEBREAB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MANUEL ANAYA OCHOAJACOBS ENGINEERING INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WONG, TODD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2328

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

WONG, TODD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEBREAB, NABIL TEKESTE

Defendants

JACOBS ENGINEERING INCORPORATED

ANAYA OCHOA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OGLE SCOTT PATRICK

OGLE, SCOTT PATRICK

Defendant Attorneys

CHAMBERLAIN DAVID E.

CHAMBERLAIN, DAVID E.

 

Court Documents

NTC:CV FILING RECORDS & AFFID

09/03/2019 - NTC:CV FILING RECORDS & AFFID

ORD:CV CONTINUANCE

09/03/2019 - ORD:CV CONTINUANCE

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

03/25/2019 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

NTC:CV FILING RECORDS & AFFID

06/27/2019 - NTC:CV FILING RECORDS & AFFID

PLD:CV ANSWER

04/15/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

01/30/2020 - DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

PLD:CV NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

05/14/2019 - PLD:CV NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

DSP:CV TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT

01/28/2020 - DSP:CV TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT

PLD:CV OTHER

10/28/2019 - PLD:CV OTHER

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DispositionAgreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketISS:CV NOTICE JUDGMENT RULE 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketTWONG:CV:AGREED JUDG SIGNED; Comment: CJ/SUBMITTED BY AND THROUGH THE CLERK'S OFFICE Result Desc: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DispositionAll Other Dispositions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEMS:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt; Comment: AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT GRANTED 8:30 UC DOCKET PEV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDSP:CV TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV OTHER; Comment: TEXAS RULES OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC:CV FILING RECORDS AND AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOT:CV OTHER; Comment: MOTION TO SET A JURY TRIAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketISS:CV CITATION; Comment: mail; Party: Defendant JACOBS ENGINEERING INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketISS:CV CITATION; Comment: mail; Party: Defendant ANAYA OCHOA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JACOBS ENGINEERING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMBERLAIN DAVID E.