Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 18:05:48 (UTC).

GAMBLE PATRICK, QUARLES TAMIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 GAMBLE PATRICK, QUARLES TAMIA was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1593

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

GAMBLE PATRICK

Applicant

QUARLES TAMIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

CISNEROS LAUREN HARTMAN

 

Court Documents

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

04/07/2021 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

04/07/2021 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

04/05/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

04/05/2021 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

04/05/2021 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:COVID APP FOR PO/TRO COMB; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: TWONG:JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CISNEROS LAUREN HARTMAN