This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 08:15:10 (UTC).

GAFFER ELLIOT H, GAFFER SCOTT WILLIAM Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 GAFFER ELLIOT H, GAFFER SCOTT WILLIAM was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0542

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

GAFFER ELLIOT H

Not Classified By Court

GAFFER SCOTT WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

BARRERA RUBEN I.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

VALLEY MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

08/29/2019 - MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

08/29/2019 - PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE

06/05/2019 - ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

06/04/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:AFFD FACTS CNCERN ID HEIRS

06/04/2019 - PLD:AFFD FACTS CNCERN ID HEIRS

PLD:AFFD FACTS CNCERN ID HEIRS

06/04/2019 - PLD:AFFD FACTS CNCERN ID HEIRS

ORD:PB IND ADMIN DETR HEIRSHIP

06/04/2019 - ORD:PB IND ADMIN DETR HEIRSHIP

PLD:PB OATH

06/04/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

PLD:PB APPOINTMENT OF R/A

05/10/2019 - PLD:PB APPOINTMENT OF R/A

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

05/10/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

PLD:PB ATTY CERT SRVC 202.057

04/22/2019 - PLD:PB ATTY CERT SRVC 202.057

PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

04/05/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

03/18/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

03/18/2019 - ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

03/15/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

03/14/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

03/14/2019 - MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

OPN:PB APPL APPT IND ADMN HEIR

03/14/2019 - OPN:PB APPL APPT IND ADMN HEIR

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSB:ATTORNEY AD LITEM FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: ISS:PB CIT PUBLICATION AFTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NTC IND ADM HEIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: OPN:PB APPL APPT IND ADMN HEIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ASM:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CONSTABLE SERVICE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less