This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 06:55:55 (UTC).

FOUST JOSHUA DAVID, FOUST PHYLLIS F Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 FOUST JOSHUA DAVID, FOUST PHYLLIS F was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0243

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

FOUST PHYLLIS F

Not Classified By Court

FOUST JOSHUA DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

GULEKE JAMES O.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MCCOY AISHAH THERESA

 

Court Documents

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

02/08/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

PLD:PB APPOINTMENT OF R/A

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB APPOINTMENT OF R/A

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

02/08/2019 - ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/06/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/05/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

OPN:PB APPL APPT IND ADMN HEIR

01/31/2019 - OPN:PB APPL APPT IND ADMN HEIR

ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

05/29/2019 - ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE

05/17/2019 - ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

02/08/2019 - ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

PLD:PB OATH

05/16/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

05/16/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB AFFIDAVIT

05/16/2019 - PLD:PB AFFIDAVIT

PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

04/05/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

PLD:PB CIT BY PUBLIC RET FILED

03/01/2019 - PLD:PB CIT BY PUBLIC RET FILED

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSB:ATTORNEY AD LITEM FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB AAL PAYOUT TO ACCT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $158.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $158.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NTC IND ADM HEIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:PB CIT PUBLICATION AFTER; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB HEIRSHIP FILING; Amount: $317.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB HEIRSHIP FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $317.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:PB APPL APPT IND ADMN HEIR

    Read MoreRead Less