This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 11/01/2021 at 17:31:11 (UTC).

FGMS HOLDINGS, LLC VS HADDON RODNEY

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 FGMS HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HADDON RODNEY. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8690

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FGMS HOLDINGS, LLC

Defendant

HADDON RODNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DITTLINGER STEPHEN L.

 

Court Documents

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

10/23/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

10/23/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/04/2019 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

PLD:CV CERT LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

12/19/2019 - PLD:CV CERT LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

PLD:CV MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

12/19/2019 - PLD:CV MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT

12/19/2019 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT

12/19/2019 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT

DSP:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/26/2019 - DSP:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

09/02/2021 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

09/08/2021 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV EXECUTION ISSUED; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUE; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV EXECUTION ISSUED; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUE; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV NOTICE JUDG RULE 306; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV CERT LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FGMS HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DITTLINGER, STEPHEN L.