This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 07:38:33 (UTC).

FELIZ APARTMENT HOMES

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 FELIZ APARTMENT HOMES was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0301

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FELIZ APARTMENT HOMES

Defendant

PARKS ORA LEE

 

Court Documents

NTC:CV APPEAL & COST RETURNED

01/24/2019 - NTC:CV APPEAL & COST RETURNED

NTC:CV APPEAL & COST RETURNED

01/22/2019 - NTC:CV APPEAL & COST RETURNED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/11/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV JP APPEAL AFFID PRO SE

01/10/2019 - OPN:CV JP APPEAL AFFID PRO SE

RET:CV WRIT POSS RET SERVED

03/12/2019 - RET:CV WRIT POSS RET SERVED

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

03/04/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

DSP:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

02/21/2019 - DSP:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NTC:CV APPEAL & COST RETURNED

01/24/2019 - NTC:CV APPEAL & COST RETURNED

NTC:CV APPEAL & COST RETURNED

01/22/2019 - NTC:CV APPEAL & COST RETURNED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/11/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV JP APPEAL AFFID PRO SE

01/10/2019 - OPN:CV JP APPEAL AFFID PRO SE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSB:CV APPEAL BD RENT DISBURSE; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $755.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV WRIT POSS RET SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV SERVICE WRIT OF POSSESS; Amount: $160.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV WRIT OF POSS OR SEQUES; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV WRIT OF POSS REAL PROP; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV SERVICE WRIT OF POSSESS; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $160.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV WRIT OF POSS OR SEQUES; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: M/WRIT OF POSSESSION; Court Name: COUNTY COURT AT LAW #2; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: EMS:JUDGE'S ORDER:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV APPEAL & COST RETURNED; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV APPEAL & COST RETURNED; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV APPEAL BD RENT PAYMENT; Amount: $795.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:CV APPEAL BD RENT ORDERED; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $795.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV NOTICE OF APPEAL AFFIDA; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:CV JP APPEAL AFFID PRO SE; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: WAV:CV JP APPEAL FILING; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $-272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV JP APPEAL FILING; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less