This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/11/2021 at 02:04:27 (UTC).

FABELA JULIANNA ELAINE, FABELA MARSHALL JOHN Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 FABELA JULIANNA ELAINE, FABELA MARSHALL JOHN was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4607

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

FABELA MARSHALL JOHN

Applicant

FABELA JULIANNA ELAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

HALL KATHRYN MOYNAHAN

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

12/04/2020 - DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

11/10/2020 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

RET:CV NTC EXTEN TEMP EX PARTE

10/27/2020 - RET:CV NTC EXTEN TEMP EX PARTE

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

10/27/2020 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

10/21/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

10/20/2020 - MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

10/20/2020 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

10/19/2020 - MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

09/30/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

09/30/2020 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

09/28/2020 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: RET:CV NTC EXTEN TEMP EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV EXT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: TWONG:JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:COVID APP FOR PO/TRO COMB; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: TWONG:JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less