This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 07:52:20 (UTC).

EWING EVELYN PAULINE PRITCHETT, PRITCHETT PAULINE CHRISMAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 EWING EVELYN PAULINE PRITCHETT, PRITCHETT PAULINE CHRISMAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0462

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

EWING EVELYN PAULINE PRITCHETT

Not Classified By Court

PRITCHETT PAULINE CHRISMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MEESE MATTHEW JAMES

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SKELTON J. HAMPTON

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

10/18/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE

05/15/2019 - ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED MUNIMENT

05/10/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED MUNIMENT

PLD:PB PROOF OF HANDWRITING

05/09/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF OF HANDWRITING

PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

03/08/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

03/07/2019 - ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

03/04/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

03/01/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

03/01/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB PROOF OF HANDWRITING

05/09/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF OF HANDWRITING

PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

05/02/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

03/18/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

PLD:PB ANSWER OF ATTY AD LITEM

03/14/2019 - PLD:PB ANSWER OF ATTY AD LITEM

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

03/13/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

MSC:PB REQ TO CLRK FOR ISSUANC

03/13/2019 - MSC:PB REQ TO CLRK FOR ISSUANC

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

03/08/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB WILL

03/07/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

OPN:PB MUNIMENT OVER 4 YEARS

03/01/2019 - OPN:PB MUNIMENT OVER 4 YEARS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ARZOLAC COLLECTIONS QCR; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSB:ATTORNEY AD LITEM FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $-38.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $-20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $38.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ASM:CONSTABLE SERVICE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NTC MUNIMNT OF TTL; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:PB MUNIMENT OVER 4 YEARS

    Read MoreRead Less