This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 11/25/2022 at 07:26:44 (UTC).

RAE EGAN, Plaintiff VS. NEUTRON HOLDINGS, INC, Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 RAE EGAN, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against NEUTRON HOLDINGS, INC, Defendant. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WONG, TODD. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2580

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

WONG, TODD

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff

EGAN, RAE ANN

Not Yet Classified and Defendants

NEUTRON HOLDINGS, INC

EGAN, RAE ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAMBERLAIN, DAVID E.

FREEMAN, JAMES ELWOOD

 

Court Documents

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

06/04/2021 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

06/07/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - DSP:CV FINAL JUDGMENT NON JURY

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV NOTICE JUDGMENT RULE 306

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV NOTICE JUDGMENT RULE 306

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV NOTICE JUDGMENT RULE 306

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV NOTICE JUDGMENT RULE 306

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV NOTICE JUDGMENT RULE 306

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV NOTICE JUDGMENT RULE 306

CV County Clerk Public Documents

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • DispositionFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISS:CV NOTICE JUDGMENT RULE 306

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDSP:CV FINAL JUDGMENT NON JURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketORD:CV PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: Agreed Final Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORD:CV TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketTWONG:JUDGE'S ORDER; Comment: AGREED ORDER TO STAY AND FOR MEDIATION CJ/SUBMISSION DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOT:CV COMPEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Comment: STINNETTPROCESS@GMAIL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketISS:CV CITATION; Party: Counter-Plaintiff, Defendant NEUTRON HOLDINGS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEUTRON HOLDINGS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMBERLAIN DAVID E.