This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 06:09:39 (UTC).

DYER CAROLYN, WILLIAMS BETTY ALLEN Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 DYER CAROLYN, WILLIAMS BETTY ALLEN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0070

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

DYER CAROLYN

Not Classified By Court

WILLIAMS BETTY ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

LUMLEY ANN LYN

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB OATH

02/05/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

02/05/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

02/05/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

01/25/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/11/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/10/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

01/10/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

01/10/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

PLD:PB WILL

01/09/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB OATH

02/05/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/11/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

01/10/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

01/10/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

PLD:PB WILL

01/09/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

05/06/2019 - MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

05/06/2019 - PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

02/14/2019 - PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

02/13/2019 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:PB COPY REQ SENT TO CUSTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB WILL

    Read MoreRead Less