This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 04/07/2020 at 18:08:01 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS NGUYEN TUAN Q

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NGUYEN TUAN Q. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2544

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

NGUYEN TUAN Q

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRONSKE THOMAS ERIK

 

Court Documents

NTC:CV HEARING

01/02/2020 - NTC:CV HEARING

NTC:CV OTHER TYPES

11/12/2019 - NTC:CV OTHER TYPES

PLD:CV FAX DOCKET CALL

11/08/2019 - PLD:CV FAX DOCKET CALL

NTC:CV HEARING

10/02/2019 - NTC:CV HEARING

PLD:CV LETTER TO COUNSEL

09/17/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO COUNSEL

PLD:CV ANSWER

07/10/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

07/03/2019 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/26/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

03/21/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

DSP:CV ORD SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/23/2020 - DSP:CV ORD SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLD:CV FAX DOCKET CALL

01/16/2020 - PLD:CV FAX DOCKET CALL

PLD:CV FILE COPY OF LETTER

12/19/2019 - PLD:CV FILE COPY OF LETTER

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/18/2019 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

PLD:CV FILE COPY OF LETTER

11/12/2019 - PLD:CV FILE COPY OF LETTER

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

09/13/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

MOT:CV SUMMARY JUDGMENT

09/13/2019 - MOT:CV SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MSC:CV RESPONSE

07/03/2019 - MSC:CV RESPONSE

PLD:CV OTHER

03/21/2019 - PLD:CV OTHER

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: P/M/SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Court Name: COUNTY COURT AT LAW #2; Duration: 10 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: P/M/SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Court Name: COUNTY COURT AT LAW #2; Duration: 10 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV NOTICE JUDG RULE 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DSP:CV ORD SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: EMS:JUDGE'S ORDER:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV FAX DOCKET CALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV FILE COPY OF LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: P/M/SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Court Name: COUNTY COURT AT LAW #1; Duration: 15 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:CV RESPONSE; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less