This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 09/13/2021 at 20:09:55 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS HUFF RICHARD E

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HUFF RICHARD E. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2845

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

HUFF RICHARD E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANCHESTER ELISE DIANE

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

08/05/2021 - DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

PLD:CV AFFID OF DUE DILIGENCE

08/06/2021 - PLD:CV AFFID OF DUE DILIGENCE

MOT:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/03/2021 - MOT:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

06/28/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

06/24/2021 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

06/24/2021 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV AFFID OF DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: EMS:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MOT:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elise D. Manchester