Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 13:00:06 (UTC).

DAVIS SIERRA, MCGEE MARK Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 DAVIS SIERRA, MCGEE MARK was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1603

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

MCGEE MARK

Applicant

DAVIS SIERRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

RILEY HILARY LYNN

 

Court Documents

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

05/06/2020 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

04/15/2020 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

03/12/2020 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

05/06/2020 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

03/31/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

03/31/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

03/27/2020 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

03/27/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

03/27/2020 - MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

03/27/2020 - MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

03/13/2020 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

03/13/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

03/13/2020 - MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

03/04/2020 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

03/04/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

03/03/2020 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: CAL:OFF DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV EXT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV EXT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV EXT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MOT:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV CIT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: EMS:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY HILARY LYNN