Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/30/2020 at 09:07:51 (UTC).

DAVIS REBEKAH, FRANCO DAVID Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 DAVIS REBEKAH, FRANCO DAVID was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0711

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

FRANCO DAVID

Applicant

DAVIS REBEKAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

CISNEROS LAUREN HARTMAN

 

Court Documents

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

02/01/2019 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

01/28/2019 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

01/28/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

01/24/2019 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/24/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

01/24/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

02/15/2019 - DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

02/01/2019 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

01/28/2019 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

01/28/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

01/24/2019 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/24/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

01/24/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO APD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV COP SENT TO APPLICANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: VJ:CV VISITING JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: TWONG:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV CIT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CISNEROS LAUREN HARTMAN