This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 07:58:55 (UTC).

DAVIS PEGGY E., ELLISON SORRELLS VIRGIE MAE Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 DAVIS PEGGY E , ELLISON SORRELLS VIRGIE MAE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0481

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

ELLISON SORRELLS VIRGIE MAE

Applicant

DAVIS PEGGY E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

TUTTLE FRANKLIN L.

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB FILE COPY OF LETTER

10/14/2019 - PLD:PB FILE COPY OF LETTER

ORD:PB INDEPENDENT ADMIN

04/09/2019 - ORD:PB INDEPENDENT ADMIN

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

03/08/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

03/05/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

03/05/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

03/05/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

MSC:PB WAIVER OF RT TO LETTERS

03/05/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF RT TO LETTERS

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

03/05/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

03/05/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

PLD:PB OATH

04/09/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

PLD:PB WILL

04/03/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

03/05/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

03/05/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

03/05/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

03/05/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

03/05/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

03/05/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

OPN:PB APPT ADM W/WILL ANNEXED

03/05/2019 - OPN:PB APPT ADM W/WILL ANNEXED

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PC1(09)INVR DUE COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MSC:PB COPY REQ SENT TO CUSTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB INVENTORY AFT 90TH DAY; Amount: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:PB APPT ADM W/WILL ANNEXED

    Read MoreRead Less