This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/28/2020 at 03:59:29 (UTC).

DAVIS EARL DWANE JR, DAVIS RENEE LOUISE Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 DAVIS EARL DWANE JR, DAVIS RENEE LOUISE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0570

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

DAVIS RENEE LOUISE

Not Classified By Court

DAVIS EARL DWANE JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

GREIF GARY W.

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

07/15/2019 - PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

06/13/2019 - PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

06/06/2019 - PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

PLD:PB PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT

05/01/2019 - PLD:PB PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT

PLD:PB OATH

04/18/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

04/18/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

04/18/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

03/25/2019 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:PB WILL

03/25/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

03/22/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

03/21/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

03/20/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

03/20/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

03/20/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ADMIN OF OATH; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: PLD:PB OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CONSTABLE SERVICE FEE; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CONSTABLE SERVICE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less