This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 07:05:41 (UTC).

DANIEL NANCY K., YOUNG DOROTHY BARINA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 DANIEL NANCY K , YOUNG DOROTHY BARINA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0266

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

DANIEL NANCY K.

Not Classified By Court

YOUNG DOROTHY BARINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

SCHLESINGER MADELINE ELIZABETH

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MEEKER PETER R.

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

04/22/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

02/08/2019 - ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/06/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB COPY OF WILL

02/06/2019 - PLD:PB COPY OF WILL

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

02/05/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/05/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPT ADM W/WILL ANNEXED

02/05/2019 - OPN:PB APPT ADM W/WILL ANNEXED

ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

05/29/2019 - ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

05/17/2019 - MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

05/17/2019 - PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

05/16/2019 - PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

ORD:PB INDEPENDENT ADMIN

04/18/2019 - ORD:PB INDEPENDENT ADMIN

PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

04/10/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

PLD:PB AFFIDAVIT

03/18/2019 - PLD:PB AFFIDAVIT

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

02/28/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MSC:PB COPY REQ SENT TO CUSTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSB:ATTORNEY AD LITEM FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NTC INDEP ADMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $-525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $-4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ADMINISTRATION FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $-317.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: OPN:PB APPT ADM W/WILL ANNEXED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ADMINISTRATION FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $317.00

    Read MoreRead Less