This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 05/08/2021 at 20:01:08 (UTC).

CUBIT CLARK KIARA MONAE VS PEREZ BRIZEYDA

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 CUBIT CLARK KIARA MONAE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEREZ BRIZEYDA. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3284

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUBIT CLARK KIARA MONAE

Defendant

PEREZ BRIZEYDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMBROSINI CONNOR LOWELL

Defendant Attorney

TALBOTT SCOTT BLANEY

 

Court Documents

ORD:CV AGREED DOCKET CONTROL

01/05/2021 - ORD:CV AGREED DOCKET CONTROL

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

12/30/2020 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

11/18/2020 - PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

NTC:CV FILING RECORDS & AFFID

09/30/2020 - NTC:CV FILING RECORDS & AFFID

DSC:CV CERT WRITTEN DISCOVERY

08/21/2020 - DSC:CV CERT WRITTEN DISCOVERY

MSC:CV AFFID MEDICAL BILLING

08/03/2020 - MSC:CV AFFID MEDICAL BILLING

DSC:CV CERT WRITTEN DISCOVERY

07/23/2020 - DSC:CV CERT WRITTEN DISCOVERY

PLD:CV ANSWER

07/23/2020 - PLD:CV ANSWER

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

07/06/2020 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

07/01/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

06/25/2020 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: JURY TRIAL; Attorney: AMBROSINI CONNOR LOWELL; Jury: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: PRETRIAL MOTIONS; Attorney: AMBROSINI CONNOR LOWELL; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ORD:CV AGREED DOCKET CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: TWONG:JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO; Amount: $624.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV FILING RECORDS & AFFID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSC:CV CERT WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:CV AFFID MEDICAL BILLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DSC:CV CERT WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV JURY DEMAND FEE; Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CV JURY DEMAND FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMBROSINI CONNOR LOWELL