This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 08/19/2021 at 06:00:17 (UTC).

CONTRERAS CALLES JORGE, MEJIA KAREN JUSTINIANO Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 CONTRERAS CALLES JORGE, MEJIA KAREN JUSTINIANO was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4724

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

CONTRERAS CALLES JORGE

Applicant

MEJIA KAREN JUSTINIANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

PELLEGRINI FLORES GIORGIO

Applicant Attorney

FINLEY FRANCES N.

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

02/08/2021 - DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

12/30/2020 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

11/20/2020 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

10/23/2020 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

PLD:CV ANSWER

10/16/2020 - PLD:CV ANSWER

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

10/14/2020 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

10/14/2020 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

10/14/2020 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

10/14/2020 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

10/12/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

10/12/2020 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

10/09/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

10/09/2020 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

10/09/2020 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV COP SENT TO APPLICANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO APD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:COVID APP FOR PO/TRO COMB; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: EMS:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:COVID APP FOR PO/TRO COMB; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: TWONG:JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINLEY FRANCES N.