This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 01/04/2023 at 18:58:25 (UTC).

COCONUT FUNDING LLC VS. SENTIA PUBLISHING LLC D/B/A SENTIA PUBLISHINGWILLIAM ENGLAND

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 COCONUT FUNDING LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SENTIA PUBLISHING LLC D/B/A SENTIA PUBLISHINGWILLIAM ENGLAND. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SHEPPERD, ERIC M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6342

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

SHEPPERD, ERIC M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COCONUT FUNDING LLC

Defendants

SENTIA PUBLISHING LLC D/B/A SENTIA PUBLISHING

ENGLAND, WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Stewart, John Alan

 

Court Documents

NTC:CV FOREIGN JUDGMENT

07/30/2019 - NTC:CV FOREIGN JUDGMENT

OPN:CV AFFID FOREIGN JDG PROSE

07/30/2019 - OPN:CV AFFID FOREIGN JDG PROSE

MSC:CV OTHER

07/30/2019 - MSC:CV OTHER

MSC:CV OTHER

07/30/2019 - MSC:CV OTHER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

08/05/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

08/06/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

MSC:CV REQUEST FOR WRIT EXECUT

09/03/2019 - MSC:CV REQUEST FOR WRIT EXECUT

RET:CV EXECUTION RET EXECUTED

12/06/2019 - RET:CV EXECUTION RET EXECUTED

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRET:CV EXECUTION RETURNED EXECUTED; Comment: 09/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketISS:CV EXECUTION ISSUED; Comment: mailed to atty; Party: Defendant SENTIA PUBLISHING LLC D/B/A SENTIA PUBLISHING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMSC:CV REQUEST FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketISS:CV ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Comment: MAILED TO ATTY 8-23; Party: Defendant SENTIA PUBLISHING LLC D/B/A SENTIA PUBLISHING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DispositionAll Other Dispositions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketDSP:CV FOREIGN JDGMNT DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketISS:CV NOTICE OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT; Party: Defendant ENGLAND, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketISS:CV NOTICE OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT; Party: Defendant SENTIA PUBLISHING LLC D/B/A SENTIA PUBLISHING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMSC:CV OTHER; Comment: STATE FOR JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMSC:CV OTHER; Comment: JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPN:CV AFFIDAVIT FOREIGN JUDGMENT PRO SE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC:CV FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less