This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 04/07/2020 at 09:29:23 (UTC).

CHURCHILL CROSSING VS ADAMS CLARA

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 CHURCHILL CROSSING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADAMS CLARA. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1616

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHURCHILL CROSSING

Defendant

ADAMS CLARA

 

Court Documents

RET:CV WRIT POSS RET SERVED

07/01/2019 - RET:CV WRIT POSS RET SERVED

PLD:CV MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

06/28/2019 - PLD:CV MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PLD:CV CERT LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

06/28/2019 - PLD:CV CERT LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

MSC:CV RECEIPT OF EXHIBITS

06/27/2019 - MSC:CV RECEIPT OF EXHIBITS

ORD:CV OTHER

06/25/2019 - ORD:CV OTHER

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

06/24/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

DSP:CV FINAL JUDGMENT NON JURY

06/24/2019 - DSP:CV FINAL JUDGMENT NON JURY

PLD:CV FAX DOCKET CALL

06/20/2019 - PLD:CV FAX DOCKET CALL

NTC:CV SETTING

05/22/2019 - NTC:CV SETTING

NTC:CV BANKRUPTCY

04/05/2019 - NTC:CV BANKRUPTCY

PLD:CV FAX DOCKET CALL

03/26/2019 - PLD:CV FAX DOCKET CALL

NTC:CV OTHER TYPES

03/15/2019 - NTC:CV OTHER TYPES

PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

03/15/2019 - PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

PLD:CV CERT MAIL RTN REC REC'D

02/28/2019 - PLD:CV CERT MAIL RTN REC REC'D

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/22/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

OPN:CV JP APPEAL AFFID PRO SE

02/21/2019 - OPN:CV JP APPEAL AFFID PRO SE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV WRIT POSS RET SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV CERT LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSB:CV APPEAL BD RENT DISBURSE; Amount: $798.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:CV RECEIPT OF EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV WRIT OF POSS REAL PROP; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV SERVICE WRIT OF POSSESS; Amount: $160.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV WRIT OF POSS OR SEQUES; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ASM:CV SERVICE WRIT OF POSSESS; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $160.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CV WRIT OF POSS OR SEQUES; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: NTC:CV OTHER TYPES; Party Type: PL1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV APPEAL BD RENT PAYMENT; Amount: $840.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV CERT MAIL RTN REC REC'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:CV APPEAL BD RENT ORDERED; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $840.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: WAV:CV JP APPEAL FILING; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $-272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV JP APPEAL FILING; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV NOTICE OF APPEAL AFFIDA; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:CV JP APPEAL AFFID PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less