This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 09/12/2021 at 17:40:08 (UTC).

CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS HERNANDEZ JONATHAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HERNANDEZ JONATHAN. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1346

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

HERNANDEZ JONATHAN

LOWES COMPANIES, INC

MAINTENANCE SUPPLY HEADQUARTERS,LP

HERNANDEZ JONATHON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIGUSHIN PAUL

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

04/15/2021 - DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

04/14/2021 - NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

03/25/2021 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

03/25/2021 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/24/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/24/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/24/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/24/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

03/16/2021 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWES COMPANIES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MAINTENANCE SUPPLY HEADQUARTERS,LP is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant