This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 07/15/2023 at 17:34:53 (UTC).

TBF FINANCIAL, LLC, Plaintiff VS. LAGUNA MADRE REHABILITATION CENTER, INC, RICARDO OLIVAS, Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 TBF FINANCIAL, LLC, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LAGUNA MADRE REHABILITATION CENTER, INC, RICARDO OLIVAS, Defendant. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SHEPPERD, ERIC M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2108

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

SHEPPERD, ERIC M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TBF FINANCIAL, LLC

Defendants

LAGUNA MADRE REHABILITATION CENTER, INC

OLIVAS, RICARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY, IAN ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

Degroot, David Arie

 

Court Documents

PUBLIC - E-Filed Petition

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV CITATION

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV CITATION

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV CITATION

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV CITATION

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:CV ANSWER

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - MOT:CV NEW TRIAL

CV County Clerk Public Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketORD:CV PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT CT2; Comment: Order Granting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketORD:CV PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT CT2; Comment: Order Setting Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOT:CV NEW TRIAL; Comment: Motion for New Trial, Counterclaims, Request for Disclosures and Special Exceptions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV ANSWER; Comment: Defendants' General Denial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISS:CV CITATION; Comment: ASUREDCIVILPROCESSAGENCY@YAHOO.COM; Party: Defendant OLIVAS, RICARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISS:CV CITATION; Comment: ASSUREDCIVILPROCESSAGENCY@YAHOO.COM; Party: Defendant LAGUNA MADRE REHABILITATION CENTER, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filed Petition; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketOPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less