Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/09/2020 at 00:08:11 (UTC).

CARRILLO FIDENCIA, ORTIZ GARCIA EDILSER OMAR Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 CARRILLO FIDENCIA, ORTIZ GARCIA EDILSER OMAR was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6084

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

ORTIZ GARCIA EDILSER OMAR

Applicant

CARRILLO FIDENCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

TRISTAN LIZBETH

 

Court Documents

MSC:CV OTHER

08/02/2019 - MSC:CV OTHER

DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

08/02/2019 - DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

RET:CV GEN NTC RETURNED SERVED

08/06/2019 - RET:CV GEN NTC RETURNED SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

08/02/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

07/30/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

07/23/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

07/23/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV GEN NTC RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: MSC:CV OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: RET:CV COPY PROT ORD RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO APD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:CV COP SENT TO APPLICANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV GENERAL NOTICE PROT ORD; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: TWONG:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV CIT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRISTAN LIZBETH