This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 07:32:32 (UTC).

CANTU RICHARD SR, CANTU SALVADOR M Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 CANTU RICHARD SR, CANTU SALVADOR M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0372

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

CANTU SALVADOR M

Applicant

CANTU RICHARD SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

RASMUS SHERYL GRAY

Applicant Attorney

BENNETT JOEL B.

 

Court Documents

ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE

05/15/2019 - ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED MUNIMENT

05/09/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED MUNIMENT

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

05/09/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:AFFD FACTS CNCERN ID HEIRS

05/09/2019 - PLD:AFFD FACTS CNCERN ID HEIRS

PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

04/10/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

PLD:PB ANSWER OF ATTY AD LITEM

03/08/2019 - PLD:PB ANSWER OF ATTY AD LITEM

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/22/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

02/22/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

PLD:PB WILL

02/21/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

02/20/2019 - ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/19/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/19/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

02/19/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

OPN:PB MUNIMENT OVER 4 YEARS

02/19/2019 - OPN:PB MUNIMENT OVER 4 YEARS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSB:ATTORNEY AD LITEM FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:PB AAL COPY ISS/SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORD ADMIT WILL MUNIMENT; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED MUNIMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:AFFD FACTS CNCERN ID HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ORD ADMIT WILL MUNIMENT; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ANSWER OF ATTY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOT MUNI + 4; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: OPN:PB MUNIMENT OVER 4 YEARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less