Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/30/2020 at 10:32:57 (UTC).

CAITLIN GUILLORY, MOFFITT MACHADO DANIEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 CAITLIN GUILLORY, MOFFITT MACHADO DANIEL was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0858

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

MOFFITT MACHADO DANIEL

Applicant

CAITLIN GUILLORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

RILEY HILARY LYNN

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

02/08/2019 - DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/30/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

01/30/2019 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

01/29/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

02/20/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

02/01/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

02/01/2019 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

02/08/2019 - DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/30/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

01/30/2019 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

01/29/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO APD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:CV COP SENT TO APPLICANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV CIT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: EMS:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY HILARY LYNN