This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 06/02/2020 at 06:18:56 (UTC).

BURKE STREBER ALEXIS, SMITH BEVERLY ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 BURKE STREBER ALEXIS, SMITH BEVERLY ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2142

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

SMITH BEVERLY ANN

Applicant

BURKE STREBER ALEXIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

LUMLEY ANN LYN

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

02/24/2020 - PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

12/16/2019 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

PLD:PB OATH

12/05/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

ORD:PB INDEPENDENT ADMIN

12/05/2019 - ORD:PB INDEPENDENT ADMIN

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

12/05/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

12/05/2019 - PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

11/15/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB WILL

11/08/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

11/08/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

MSC:PB WAIVER OF RT TO LETTERS

11/07/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF RT TO LETTERS

MSC:PB WAIVER OF RT TO LETTERS

11/07/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF RT TO LETTERS

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

11/07/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

11/07/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB DISTRIBUTEES CONSENT

11/07/2019 - PLD:PB DISTRIBUTEES CONSENT

OPN:PB APPT ADM W/WILL ANNEXED

11/07/2019 - OPN:PB APPT ADM W/WILL ANNEXED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ADMIN OF OATH; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 11; Event Description: PLD:PB OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: ORD:PB INDEPENDENT ADMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NTC INDEP ADMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER OF RT TO LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER OF RT TO LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB DISTRIBUTEES CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: OPN:PB APPT ADM W/WILL ANNEXED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CONSTABLE SERVICE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less