This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/07/2020 at 09:38:07 (UTC).

BRUSTEIN LANNY B

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 BRUSTEIN LANNY B was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1585

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRUSTEIN LANNY B

Defendant

HERMAN MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOYAL BRET CLYDE

 

Court Documents

ORD:CV SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

08/05/2019 - ORD:CV SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

MOT:CV SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

07/26/2019 - MOT:CV SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

MOT:CV SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

06/07/2019 - MOT:CV SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

02/27/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

02/21/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:CV SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: VJ:CV VISITING JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MOT:CV SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MOT:CV SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less