This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 07:00:19 (UTC).

BREWER TRAVIS R

Case Summary

On 02/03/2019 BREWER TRAVIS R was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0250

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

BREWER TRAVIS R

Not Classified By Court

BREWER ANNA CHRISTINA JACKSON

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB OATH

08/20/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

PLD:PB OATH

08/20/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

08/20/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

08/20/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB PROOF BY SUBSCRIBNG WIT

08/20/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF BY SUBSCRIBNG WIT

PLD:PB WILL

02/06/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/06/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

02/05/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

02/04/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

05/16/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

05/16/2019 - PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/08/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB WILL

02/06/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/06/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

02/05/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

02/04/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ADMIN OF OATH; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: PLD:PB OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: PLD:PB OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB PROOF BY SUBSCRIBNG WIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:PB LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less