This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 04/05/2020 at 05:11:33 (UTC).

BRADFIELD HEISER REBECCA RUTH, BRADFIELD MARY ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 BRADFIELD HEISER REBECCA RUTH, BRADFIELD MARY ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2135

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

BRADFIELD MARY ANN

Applicants

BRADFIELD MCGAUGHY JENNIFER ANN

BRADFIELD HEISER REBECCA RUTH

BRADFIELD STOCKDALE MELINDA NELL

 

Court Documents

MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

03/24/2020 - MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

PLD:PB APPL EXT TIME TO FILE

03/24/2020 - PLD:PB APPL EXT TIME TO FILE

PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

03/16/2020 - PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

01/22/2020 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

PLD:PB OATH

01/09/2020 - PLD:PB OATH

PLD:PB OATH

01/09/2020 - PLD:PB OATH

PLD:PB OATH

01/09/2020 - PLD:PB OATH

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

01/09/2020 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

01/09/2020 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB CODICIL

11/12/2019 - PLD:PB CODICIL

PLD:PB WILL

11/12/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

11/12/2019 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

11/08/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

11/07/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB EFILED CODICIL

11/07/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED CODICIL

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

11/07/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

11/07/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

11/07/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB APPL EXT TIME TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ADMIN OF OATH; Amount: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED CODICIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CONSTABLE SERVICE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:MH ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.